This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2022 at 15:53:19 (UTC).

DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE FOR MICHAEL J. MONA JR. VS ISAAC NORMAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE FOR MICHAEL J MONA JR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ISAAC NORMAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1782

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION

Defendant

NORMAN ISAAC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGITTINO TRICIA L ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/6/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • Hearing09/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dayco Funding Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEGITTINO TRICIA L