This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 01:13:35 (UTC).

DAYANA PARTIDA VS THE CITY OF CARSON

Case Summary

On 07/10/2018 DAYANA PARTIDA filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against THE CITY OF CARSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4161

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PARTIDA DAYANA

Defendant

CARSON THE CITY OF

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

7/10/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

7/10/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

7/10/2018: VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

8/13/2018: ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

Minute Order

10/19/2018: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

10/19/2018: Stipulation and Order

Request for Dismissal

12/7/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

3/11/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

11/8/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/7/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for

11/7/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

7/12/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Dayana Partida (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Dayana Partida (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Dayana Partida (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Continue Trial Setting Conference; Order); Filed by Carson, The City Of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-10-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less