This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 01:45:53 (UTC).

DAY TO DAY FASHION INC VS 1128 1130 LOS ANGELES LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2018 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by DAY TO DAY FASHION INC against 1128 1130 LOS ANGELES LLC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5326

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DAY TO DAY FASHION INC

DAY TO DAY FASHION INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

1128-1130 LOS ANGELES LLC

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/20/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/27/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

7/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/19/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

9/26/2018: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/28/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration

2/28/2019: Declaration

Motion for Summary Judgment

2/28/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration

5/17/2019: Declaration

Stipulation and Order

5/20/2019: Stipulation and Order

Order

5/31/2019: Order

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

6/4/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Declaration

6/4/2019: Declaration

Proof of Service by Mail

6/4/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Judicial Notice

6/4/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/28/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/19/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/19/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Day to Day Fashion Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Day to Day Fashion Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by Day to Day Fashion Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Declaration (OF ARYA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL); Filed by Day to Day Fashion Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant 1128-1130 Los Angeles, LLC's Unopposed E...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Order (Granting Defendant's Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial); Filed by 1128-1130 Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Notice of Ruling (REGARDING DEFENDANT 1128-1130 LOS ANGELES LLC'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by 1128-1130 Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Day to Day Fashion Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Day to Day Fashion Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DECLARATION OF ARYA RHODES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Day to Day Fashion Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695326    Hearing Date: January 02, 2020    Dept: 48

MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET TWO); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Day To Day Fashion, Inc.

RESPONDING PARTY(S): Defendant 1128-1130 Los Angeles, LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE: