This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2022 at 14:22:57 (UTC).

DAWSON, ANGEL VS PERALIZ, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 DAWSON, ANGEL filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against PERALIZ, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOSLEY, GIA G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0639

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOSLEY, GIA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAWSON ANGEL

Respondent

PERALIZ CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SISSON MICHAEL FITZPATRIC

 

Court Documents

Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

8/30/2021: Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

8/30/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

8/30/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - HRG on 10/15/21 at 8:30 am in Dept. 11 (per Courtroom)

9/24/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - HRG on 10/15/21 at 8:30 am in Dept. 11 (per Courtroom)

Minute Order

9/24/2021: Minute Order

Response - Elder/Dependent Abuse

9/23/2021: Response - Elder/Dependent Abuse

Proof of Service - Mail

9/23/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Proof of Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Service

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

8/30/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

8/30/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

8/30/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - HRG on 11/04/21 at 8:30 am in Dept. 11

10/15/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - HRG on 11/04/21 at 8:30 am in Dept. 11

Minute Order

10/15/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/4/2021: Minute Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (HRG on 11/04/21 at 8:30 am in Dept. 11 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (HRG on 10/15/21 at 8:30 am in Dept. 11 (per Courtroom) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketResponse - Elder/Dependent Abuse; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPetition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SISSON MICHAEL FITZPATRIC