This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 13:26:02 (UTC).

DAWN WOOD VS OLSON URBAN HOUSING LLC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 DAWN WOOD filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against OLSON URBAN HOUSING LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THERESA M. TRABER, CHRISTOPHER K. LUI, JILL FEENEY and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6098

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THERESA M. TRABER

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

JILL FEENEY

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOOD DAWN

Claimant

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

THE OLSON COMPANY

OLSON URBAN HOUSING LLC

PROFESSIONAL DESIGN ASSOCIATES

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SANITATION LLC

MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

ALAMITOS BUILDING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STANLEY MARTIN LOUIS ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

AMUNDSON ROBERT GREGORY ESQ.

HERZOG VANESSA KATHRYN ESQ.

JAMNESHAN SHIRLEY ELAINE ESQ.

Other Attorneys

JOHNSEN GREGORY FRANCIS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

10/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Witness List - AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST

10/5/2022: Witness List - AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST

Exhibit List - AMENDED JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST

10/5/2022: Exhibit List - AMENDED JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST

Jury Instructions - AMENDED JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS LIST

10/5/2022: Jury Instructions - AMENDED JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS LIST

Jury Instructions - AMENDED JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS

10/5/2022: Jury Instructions - AMENDED JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS

Notice of Ruling

9/30/2022: Notice of Ruling

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO USE OF THE IRRELEVANT

9/29/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO USE OF THE IRRELEVANT

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5: RE OSHA VIOLATIONS

9/29/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5: RE OSHA VIOLATIONS

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: TO PRECLUDE LAY WITNESSE

9/29/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: TO PRECLUDE LAY WITNESSE

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9: TO EXCLUDE PURCHASE OR W

9/29/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9: TO EXCLUDE PURCHASE OR W

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR T

9/29/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR T

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: TO EXCLUDE SPECULATIVE E

9/29/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: TO EXCLUDE SPECULATIVE E

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF S

9/29/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' OLSON URBAN HOUSING, LLC DBA THE OLSON COMPANY, AND MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF S

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE SEPTEMBER 28, 2022 HEARING...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE SEPTEMBER 28, 2022 HEARING...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE SEPTEMBER 28, 2022 HEARING...) OF 09/27/2022

9/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE SEPTEMBER 28, 2022 HEARING...) OF 09/27/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

9/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Opposition - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9: TO EXCLUDE PURCHASE OF WARS'OMPENSATIONLIEN AND APPLIY OFFSET POST JUDGMENT

9/19/2022: Opposition - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9: TO EXCLUDE PURCHASE OF WARS'OMPENSATIONLIEN AND APPLIY OFFSET POST JUDGMENT

132 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • Hearing02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Hearing02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • Hearing02/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate (The Trial of All Issues to Liability of Defendant Olson and Plaintiffs' Damages, Filed by the Defendant) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketAmended Joint Trial Exhibit List; Filed by OLSON URBAN HOUSING LLC (Defendant); MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
207 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER;AND ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Cypress Insurance Company (Claimant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FIRST LIEN RIGHTS OF EMPLOYER; REQUEST FOR SERVICE; NOTICE OF CREDIT RIGHTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT OLSON URBAN HOUSING INC LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Dawn Wood (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dawn Wood (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6098 Hearing Date: September 28, 2022 Dept: 30

DAWN WOOD VS OLSON URBAN HOUSING LLCCourt Order Re: Continuance of the September 28, 2022 Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate the Trial of All Issues Relating to Liability of Defendant Olson and Plaintiffs' Damages to October 20, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. On the Court's own motion, the Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate The Trial of All Issues to Liability of Defendant Olson and Plaintiffs' Damages, Filed by the Defendant scheduled for 09/28/2022 is continued to 10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at Spring Street Courthouse. The motion to bifurcate will be heard by the trial court. The parties are ordered to include filed versions of the motion and any opposition in Tab "B" of the Trial Binder, behind any motions in limine. The Moving Party is ordered to give notice


b'

Case Number: ****6098 Hearing Date: November 1, 2021 Dept: 30

Defendant’s motion to bifurcate the issues of liability and damages at trial is CONTINUED to the June 14, 2022, the scheduled trial date. The motion will be heard by the trial court.

The Court ORDERS that the bifurcation briefing be included in the trial binders in Tab B along with any motions in limine filed in the case.

Moving party ORDERED to give notice.

'


Case Number: ****6098    Hearing Date: July 23, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion to Bifurcate

The Motion to Bifurcate the Liability and Damages Phases at trial is CONTINUED to the trial date on September 18, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. to be heard and decided by the court assigned to conduct the trial of this action.  Defendant Olson Urban Housing, LLC dba The Olson Company may include the motion to bifurcate and stipulation with the motions in limine in the parties’ joint trial binder, pursuant to the First Amended Standing Order Re: Final Status Conference, Personal Injury Courts, effective as of April 16, 2018, to present to the judge to whom this matter is assigned for trial.

Defendant Olson Urban Housing, LLC dba The Olson Company is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOBILE MODULAR MANAGEMENT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALAMITOS BUILDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Olson As Trustee And Beneficiary, Marion is a litigant