This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2023 at 06:37:46 (UTC).

DAWN THOMPSON VS ROB WAGNER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 DAWN THOMPSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ROB WAGNER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN, MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF, MONICA BACHNER and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8985

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CURTIS A. KIN

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

MONICA BACHNER

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON DAWN

Defendants

HOANG THAO

WAGNER ROB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENOWITZ DANIEL J.

Defendant Attorney

BERKE JEFF

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/4/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/1/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/25/2023

7/25/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/25/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

7/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Settlement

7/24/2023: Notice of Settlement

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

3/14/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

3/8/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/08/2023

3/8/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/08/2023

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

6/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

6/2/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/02/2022

6/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/02/2022

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TAMMY COBB IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

8/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TAMMY COBB IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. ENOWITZ RE: NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

8/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. ENOWITZ RE: NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Request for Judicial Notice

8/18/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

8/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF DAWN THOMPSON FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS

8/18/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF DAWN THOMPSON FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 72 - Hon. Joseph Lipnereffective 08/07/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Dawn Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: Rob Wagner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/25/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Status Conference re: Arbitration scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10/30/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference re: Arbitration scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Dawn Thompson (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Continuing Post-Arbitration Status Conference; Filed by: Dawn Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: Rob Wagner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Michael Thompson in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Dawn Thompson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff Dawn Thompson for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Filed by: Dawn Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: Rob Wagner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Tammy Cobb in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Dawn Thompson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Dawn Thompson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Samantha Reynoso in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Dawn Thompson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Dawn Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: Rob Wagner (Defendant); Thao Hoang (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Dawn Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: Rob Wagner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dawn Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: Rob Wagner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less