This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2020 at 08:21:56 (UTC).

DAWN KRAEMER-CONNER, , BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST CHRISTOPHER CONNER VS DEL AMO HOSPITAL, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 DAWN KRAEMER-CONNER, , BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST CHRISTOPHER CONNER filed an Other lawsuit against DEL AMO HOSPITAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6065

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRAEMER-CONNER DAWN BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST CHRISTOPHER CONNER

Defendants

DEL AMO HOSPITAL INC

UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES INC.

UHS OF DELAWARE INC. DOE 51

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

BRENNAN MOIRA S.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURR

12/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/1/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/1/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/18/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MOIRA S. BRENNAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MOIRA S. BRENNAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

10/21/2020: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES [NOT A GENERAL APPEARANCE

10/21/2020: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES [NOT A GENERAL APPEARANCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE K. CARSON IN S QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF [NOT A GENERAL APPEARANCE

10/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE K. CARSON IN S QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF [NOT A GENERAL APPEARANCE

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/21/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/21/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demand for Jury Trial

10/23/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Declaration - DECLARATION DEL AMO HOSPITAL, INC.S DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

10/23/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DEL AMO HOSPITAL, INC.S DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

Answer

10/23/2020: Answer

Declaration - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

10/23/2020: Declaration - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Related Case

9/25/2020: Notice of Related Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 16; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Related Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate; Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dawn Kraemer-Conner, , by and through her Successor in Interest Christopher Conner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Dawn Kraemer-Conner, , by and through her Successor in Interest Christopher Conner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Dawn Kraemer-Conner, , by and through her Successor in Interest Christopher Conner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Del Amo Hospital, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Service); Filed by Del Amo Hospital, Inc (Defendant); Universal Health Services, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES [NOT A GENERAL APPEARANCE); Filed by Del Amo Hospital, Inc (Defendant); Universal Health Services, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF MICHELLE K. CARSON IN S QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF [NOT A GENERAL APPEARANCE); Filed by Del Amo Hospital, Inc (Defendant); Universal Health Services, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by Universal Health Services, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (- *Dept 47 has older case*); Filed by Dawn Kraemer-Conner, , by and through her Successor in Interest Christopher Conner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dawn Kraemer-Conner, , by and through her Successor in Interest Christopher Conner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dawn Kraemer-Conner, , by and through her Successor in Interest Christopher Conner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF CHRIS CONNER AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST); Filed by Dawn Kraemer-Conner, , by and through her Successor in Interest Christopher Conner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dawn Kraemer-Conner, , by and through her Successor in Interest Christopher Conner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEL AMO HOSPITAL, INC., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL