This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2023 at 20:08:42 (UTC).

DAVIT HARUTYUNYAN VS WESLEY SCOTT ROLPH, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 DAVIT HARUTYUNYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WESLEY SCOTT ROLPH, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0705

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARUTYUNYAN DAVIT

Defendants

MCR CONSTRUCTION INC. A CORPORATION

ROLPH AN INDIVIDUAL WESLEY SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARUSO MARY L.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/17/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/17/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/13/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 12/19/2022

12/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 12/19/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

12/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/23/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

01/27/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: MCR Construction, Inc., a corporation (Defendant), Wesley Scott Rolph, an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed Failing To File Proof of Service Per CRC 3.110 (b) and (f), or in alternative an Order for Publication scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by DAVIT HARUTYUNYAN on 10/17/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Davit Harutyunyan as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Davit Harutyunyan (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2022

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Davit Harutyunyan (Plaintiff); As to: Wesley Scott Rolph, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/07/2022; Service Cost: 142.42; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed Failing To File Proof of Service Per CRC 3.110 (b) and (f), or in alternative an Order for Publication scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 12/19/2022; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D updated: Result Date to 12/19/2022; Result Type to Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
12/01/2022

DocketUpdated -- Davit Harutyunyan (Plaintiff): First Name changed from Daavit to Davit

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: DAVIT HARUTYUNYAN (Plaintiff); As to: WESLEY SCOTT ROLPH, an individual (Defendant); MCR CONSTRUCTION, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DAVIT HARUTYUNYAN (Plaintiff); As to: WESLEY SCOTT ROLPH, an individual (Defendant); MCR CONSTRUCTION, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DAVIT HARUTYUNYAN (Plaintiff); As to: WESLEY SCOTT ROLPH, an individual (Defendant); MCR CONSTRUCTION, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less