This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 23:13:54 (UTC).

DAVIT DAVTYAN VS ALBERTO PADILLA CASTILLEJO

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 DAVIT DAVTYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALBERTO PADILLA CASTILLEJO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0366

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVTYAN DAVIT

Defendant

PADILLA CASTILLEJO ALBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELIKYAN GEVORG

Defendant Attorney

BARRENO ALEXANDRA

 

Court Documents

Answer

12/14/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

11/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

11/9/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/21/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2023
  • Hearing10/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Hearing04/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Hearing04/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alberto Padilla Castillejo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Davit Davtyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Davit Davtyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Davit Davtyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Davit Davtyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRENO ALEXANDRA