This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 00:00:55 (UTC).

DAVIS, SHANNON VS DAVIS, RODNEY L

Case Summary

On 04/12/2018 DAVIS, SHANNON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DAVIS, RODNEY L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HEIDEL, SARAH J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0792

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HEIDEL, SARAH J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAVIS SHANNON

Respondent

DAVIS RODNEY L

Other

COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LORENZ JENNA MARIE

Respondent Attorneys

SOMOGYI EDWARD LLOYD

THORNE BRIAN GEORGE

Other Attorneys

SULLIVAN KANDY KAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Declaration (in support of atty's motion to be relieved ); Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • RFO/MTN - Withdraw/Be Relieved as Counsel of Record; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Memorandum - Points and Authorities; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department B, Heidel, Sarah J., Presiding; Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Proof of Service - Mail; Filed by Minor's Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Declaration (Re minors' counsel fees ); Filed by Minor's Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department B, Heidel, Sarah J., Presiding; Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor; Filed by Minor's Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2010
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • Notice - Change of Address; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2008
  • Mail - Returned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2008
  • Miscellaneous (Ntc of Case Reassignment ); Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2008
  • Petition - Transfer In Case - No Fee; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2008
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2008
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2008
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2008
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SULLIVAN KANDY KAY