This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2020 at 01:44:57 (UTC).

DAVIN BROOKS VS MICHELLE STEPHENSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/08/2018 DAVIN BROOKS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHELLE STEPHENSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5551

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

BROOKS DAVIN

REINER MARGARET

JONES ROGET

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

STEPHENSON MICHELLE

REINER MARGARET

DOES 1-50

JONES ROGET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KASHANI DAVID P. ESQ.

KASHANI DAVID PEDDY

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PAPUCHYAN MONA

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH

SHELTON MARGARET KELLY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/23/2020

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: MICHELLE STEPHENSON

11/7/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: MICHELLE STEPHENSON

Notice - NOTICE MICHELLE STEPHENSON AND ROGET JONES NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

10/29/2019: Notice - NOTICE MICHELLE STEPHENSON AND ROGET JONES NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/17/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/27/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

7/29/2019: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/29/2019: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/29/2019: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

12/14/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/4/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Proof of Personal Service

5/6/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

6/10/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/10/2019: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/12/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

SUMMONS -

5/8/2018: SUMMONS -

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • Hearing05/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference) of 07/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docketat 11:01 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Margaret Reiner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Margaret Reiner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Davin Brooks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Michelle Stephenson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Michelle Stephenson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michelle Stephenson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Davin Brooks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Davin Brooks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC705551    Hearing Date: November 06, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

DAVIN BROOKS,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

MICHELLE STEPHENSEN, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC705551

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 6, 2019

Plaintiff, Davin Brooks filed this action against Defendants, Michelle Stephensen and Margaret Reiner for damages arising out of an automobile accident. Plaintiff was a passenger in a vehicle owned by Stephenson and driven by Cross-Defendant and Cross-Complainant, Roget Jones. The other vehicle was driven by Reiner.

At this time Brooks, Stephenson, and Jones have agreed to settle all claims among them. Stephensen and Jones will pay Brooks $50,000, the limit on their insurance policy, to settle all claims against them. Stephensen and Jones seek an order from the Court finding that the settlement is in good faith.

Defendant timely and properly served the moving papers on the only other party in the action, Reiner. Any opposition to the motion was due on or before 10/24/19. No party has filed opposition to the motion. The burden on a motion for determination of good faith settlement rests squarely on the party opposing the finding of good faith. CCP §877.6(d). In light of the lack of opposition, no party has met that burden. The motion for determination of good faith settlement is therefore granted.

Moving parties are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.