This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 02:07:46 (UTC).

DAVID WALKER-HARTSOCK, ET AL. VS EXCEL CONSTRUCTION LA INC.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 DAVID WALKER-HARTSOCK filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against EXCEL CONSTRUCTION LA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1480

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WALKER-HARTSOCK DAVID

WALKER-HARTSOCK TANNER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

EXCEL CONSTRUCTION LA INC.

Cross Defendants

PREFERRED REMODELING & DEVELOPMENT INC. ALIAS LMH LAWYERS

PREFERRED REMODELING & DEVELOPMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STONE JASON M.

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL ETHAN O.

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

11/10/2021: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

12/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS AGAINST DEFENDANT EXCEL CONSTRUCTION LA INC.S AND FILING OF DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND CROSS-COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ANSWER AND CROSS

11/3/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS AGAINST DEFENDANT EXCEL CONSTRUCTION LA INC.S AND FILING OF DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND CROSS-COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ANSWER AND CROSS

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS AGAINST DEFENDANT EXCEL CONSTRUCTION LA INC.S AND FILING OF DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND CROSS-COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ANSWE

11/3/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS AGAINST DEFENDANT EXCEL CONSTRUCTION LA INC.S AND FILING OF DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND CROSS-COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ANSWE

Answer

11/10/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT EXCEL CONSTRUCTION LA INC. AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT EXCEL CONSTRUCTION LA INC. AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

11/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 11/17/2021

11/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 11/17/2021

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

9/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/23/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/23/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/23/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • Hearing12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by David Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff); Tanner Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by David Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff); Tanner Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Excel Construction LA Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Excel Construction LA Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of 11/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by David Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff); Tanner Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by David Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff); Tanner Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by David Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff); Tanner Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff); Tanner Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement (of Damages); Filed by David Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff); Tanner Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by David Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff); Tanner Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff); Tanner Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff); Tanner Walker-Hartsock (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE JASON M.