This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2019 at 01:35:44 (UTC).

DAVID WALDER VS DELMORGAN GROUP LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 DAVID WALDER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DELMORGAN GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0357

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WALDER DAVID

Defendants and Respondents

MORGANBESSER NEIL

DELGADO< ROB

DELMORGAN GROUP LLC

DOES 1_20

DELGADO< ROBELIO A

DELMORGAN & CO LLC

DELMORGAN GROUP LLC AND DELMORGAN & CO

DELGADO ROBELIO A

DELGADO ROB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS A. LIPOFSKY

LIPOFSKY LOUIS A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SKLAR JEFFREY A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL AND OF DISCHARGE OF OSC'S RE: SANTIONS & PROOF OF SERVICE

12/20/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL AND OF DISCHARGE OF OSC'S RE: SANTIONS & PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order -

1/17/2018: Minute Order -

SUMMONS -

2/10/2017: SUMMONS -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/2/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

3/3/2017: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

NOTICE OF HEARING OF: 1. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND ETC

3/9/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING OF: 1. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND ETC

DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A. SKLAR RE: MEET AND CONFER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

4/10/2017: DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A. SKLAR RE: MEET AND CONFER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OF: 1. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC

5/8/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OF: 1. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; ETC.

5/15/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; ETC.

PROOF OF SERVICE RE FILING OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, ETC. PREVIOUSLY SERVED ON APRIL 17, 2017

5/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE RE FILING OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, ETC. PREVIOUSLY SERVED ON APRIL 17, 2017

NOTICE OF REQUEST TO TAKE HEARINGS OFF CALENDAR: 1. DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT, ETC.; ETC.

7/6/2017: NOTICE OF REQUEST TO TAKE HEARINGS OFF CALENDAR: 1. DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT, ETC.; ETC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

8/18/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OF: 1. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND ETC

8/28/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OF: 1. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND ETC

Minute Order -

9/26/2017: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING OSC RE:DISMISSAL

10/24/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING OSC RE:DISMISSAL

Minute Order -

10/26/2017: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF LOUIS A. LIPOFSKY IN OPPOSITION TO OSC FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

11/6/2017: DECLARATION OF LOUIS A. LIPOFSKY IN OPPOSITION TO OSC FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

Minute Order -

11/17/2017: Minute Order -

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL AND OF DISCHARGE OF OSC'S RE: SANTIONS & PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53; (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by David Walder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF LOUIS A. LIPOFSKY IN OPPOSITION TO OSC FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53; (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by David Walder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by David Walder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Walder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT BY DAVID WALDER FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DELMORGAN GROUP LLC is a litigant