Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 15:44:58 (UTC).

DAVID VICTORIAN VS KENNETH MALIK ROBERSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 DAVID VICTORIAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KENNETH MALIK ROBERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6320

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTORIAN DAVID

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ROBERSON KENNETH MALIK

ROBERSON KENNETH R.

EDWARDS TODD

EDWARDS CHRISTINA ALIDA

MATSUYAMA SHINNOSUKE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

EDWARDS CHRISTINA ALIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

YUN CHARLES C.

Other Attorneys

REYES JORGE H.

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

3/8/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

3/8/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

2/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

1/12/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/3/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2023
  • Hearing11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Hearing06/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Hearing05/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alida Christina Edwards Erroneously Sued As Christina Alida Edwards (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alida Christina Edwards Erroneously Sued As Christina Alida Edwards (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Alida Christina Edwards Erroneously Sued As Christina Alida Edwards (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by David Victorian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David Victorian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David Victorian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David Victorian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David Victorian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by David Victorian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Victorian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Victorian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYES JORGE H.