This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2022 at 22:21:55 (UTC).

DAVID VERA VS DAMCO USA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 DAVID VERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DAMCO USA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1041

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERA DAVID

Defendants

DAMCO USA INC.

MAERSK INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGHABALA PAYAM

Defendant Attorney

VASQUEZ DAVID R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/23/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

9/23/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/23/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/21/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/3/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2024
  • Hearing08/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • Hearing02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by David Vera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Damco USA, Inc. (Defendant); Maersk, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Damco USA, Inc. (Defendant); Maersk, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Damco USA, Inc. (Defendant); Maersk, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David Vera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David Vera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Vera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by David Vera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Vera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAMCO USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MAERSK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL