Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 16:08:07 (UTC).

DAVID VAN ZILE VS RALPH'S GROCERY COMPANY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 DAVID VAN ZILE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against RALPH'S GROCERY COMPANY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN I. JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9929

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAN ZILE DAVID

Defendants

RALPH'S GROCERY COMPANY INC.

THE VONS COMPANIES INC. A MICHIGAN CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

SAFEWAY INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. FKA JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON MARK PARKER JR

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF POTENTIAL ADD-ON CASES FOR COORDINATION OF THIS CASE INTO JCCP 4872

4/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF POTENTIAL ADD-ON CASES FOR COORDINATION OF THIS CASE INTO JCCP 4872

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/12/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 03/18/2021

3/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 03/18/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

3/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • Hearing05/07/2021 at 11:30 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketOrder Re: Coordination of Add-On Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Submission of Potential Add-On Cases for Coordination of This Case Into JCCP 4872); Filed by David Van Zile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by David Van Zile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by David Van Zile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by David Van Zile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by David Van Zile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by David Van Zile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 09:54 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 03/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Van Zile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Van Zile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE VONS COMPANIES INC DBA PAVILIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant