This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2021 at 04:19:01 (UTC).

DAVID VAN DYKE VS TARGET CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 DAVID VAN DYKE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5993

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAN DYKE DAVID

Defendant

TARGET CORPORATION DBA TARGET STORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUCERO LINDA

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

8/17/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/17/2021

8/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/17/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/03/2021

8/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/03/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

PI General Order

2/28/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

2/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/18/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

2/18/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial; Final Status Conference) of 08/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 08/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Van Dyke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by David Van Dyke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Van Dyke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA