Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 13:46:30 (UTC).

DAVID TSAO VS SYLVIA ENA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 DAVID TSAO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SYLVIA ENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5531

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TSAO DAVID

Defendants

DTLA REAL ESTATE INC. /DBA KELLER WILLIAMS DTLA REALTY

ENA SYLVIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LI HONG

LI HONG ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

KLIER-ERLICH RINAT

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

4/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

Substitution of Attorney

5/3/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

1/21/2021: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Case Management Statement

1/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

10/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

11/2/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Mail

11/2/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

11/16/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/17/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • Hearing03/02/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Hearing02/18/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by DTLA REAL ESTATE, INC. /DBA KELLER WILLIAMS DTLA REALTY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Posting of Jury fees); Filed by DAVID TSAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by DTLA REAL ESTATE, INC. /DBA KELLER WILLIAMS DTLA REALTY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by DAVID TSAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SYLVIA ENA (Defendant); DTLA REAL ESTATE, INC. /DBA KELLER WILLIAMS DTLA REALTY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DAVID TSAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by DAVID TSAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by DAVID TSAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DAVID TSAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DAVID TSAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DAVID TSAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DAVID TSAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DAVID TSAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DTLA REAL ESTATE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA KW COMMERCIAL DOWNTOWN LA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLIER-ERLICH RINAT