This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 01:57:37 (UTC).

DAVID TRUE VS LAYTON CAPITAL CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 DAVID TRUE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LAYTON CAPITAL CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU, DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH, MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3876

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE LU

DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TRUE DAVID

TRUE GABRIELLA

Defendants and Respondents

MAXON INDUSTRIES INC

DOES 1 TO 50

LAYTON CAPITAL CORP

MAXON FLEET SERVICES CORP

Other

MORROW & WHITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ARNOLD & ITKIN LLP

BROILLET BRUCE

VANGELDER ALAN LAWRENCE

ADAMS REBECCA

Defendant Attorneys

WHITE CHRISTOPHER A

FOX DANA ALDEN

 

Court Documents

Witness List

12/9/2020: Witness List

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: LONG CAUSE DETERMINATION)

8/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: LONG CAUSE DETERMINATION)

SUMMONS -

2/8/2018: SUMMONS -

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL E.ISRAEL

3/21/2018: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL E.ISRAEL

Jury Instructions

2/21/2020: Jury Instructions

Exhibit List

2/24/2020: Exhibit List

Opposition - OPPOSITION EXHIBIT TO PLTF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MIL 11

2/24/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION EXHIBIT TO PLTF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MIL 11

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE FOR CORY ITKIN

12/3/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE FOR CORY ITKIN

Application - APPLICATION VERIFIED PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF JASON ITKIN

11/13/2019: Application - APPLICATION VERIFIED PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF JASON ITKIN

Application - APPLICATION VERIFIED PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF JACOB KARAM

11/13/2019: Application - APPLICATION VERIFIED PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF JACOB KARAM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HEARING ON MOTION TO ...)

10/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HEARING ON MOTION TO ...)

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 8

10/2/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 8

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 7

10/2/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 7

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 3

10/2/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 3

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

10/3/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

10/8/2019: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

Association of Attorney

7/15/2019: Association of Attorney

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE VERIFIED APLICATION OF RYAN SCOTT MACLEOD TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE AS TO THE FOLLOWING CASE

4/25/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE VERIFIED APLICATION OF RYAN SCOTT MACLEOD TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE AS TO THE FOLLOWING CASE

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • Hearing05/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Status Conference (relong cause (non-appearance)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: long cause (non-appearance))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Long Cause Trial Determination) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Long Cause Trial Determination) of 03/25/2021, Long-Cause Trial Package Guidelines); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Long Cause Trial Determination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (long cause binders) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: long cause binders)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Status Conference (ReLong Cause Determination) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
191 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by Layton Capital Corp (Defendant); Maxon Industries, Inc (Defendant); Maxon Fleet Services Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS LAYTON CAPITAL CORP. MAXON INDUSTRIES INC. AND MAXON FLEET SERVICES CORP.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS LAYTON CAPITAL CORP., MAXON INDUSTRIES, INC. AND MAXON FLEET SERVICES CORP.S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS LAYTON CAPITAL CORP MAXON INDUSTRIES INC. AND MAXON FLEET SERVICES CORP.S NOTICE MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by David True (Plaintiff); Gabriella True (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE AND NEGLIGENCE PER SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David True (Plaintiff); Gabriella True (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693876    Hearing Date: November 19, 2020    Dept: 32

David True v. Layton Capital Corporation, et al., Case No. BC693876

The Court has reviewed the parties’ proposed Long Cause Trial Package and issues this tentative order in advance of Status Conference Re: Long Cause Determination, which shall be held on November 19, 2020, at 1:30 p.m.  The Court’s clerk shall provide notice of this tentative order.

1. Binders – The Court appears to have two different sets of binders, one from Plaintiffs and one from Defendants.  For example, there are two different binders labeled “Binder #1.”  The Court requires one set of binders with joint trial documents.

5. Defendants’ Motions in Limine – Defendants did not include any reply briefs to the motions in limine.  Defendants shall include the reply brief behind the respective opposition, separated by colored paper, or shall prepare a page stating that no reply brief was filed.

6. Jury Instructions – There is no joint list of jury instructions signed by both parties. 

Case Number: BC693876    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

david true, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

layton capital corp., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC693876

Hearing Date: December 17, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motions to be admitted pro hac vice

Attorneys Jacob Karam, Jason Itkin, and Cory Itkin (“Counsel”) move to be admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs David True and Gabriella True (“Plaintiffs”). Per California Rules of Court, rule 9.40, attorneys who are licensed to practice and in good standing in other states may, upon court approval, appear as counsel pro hac vice in a pending case if an active member of the State Bar of California also appears as counsel of record. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 9.40, subd. (a).) Counsel are licensed to practice and in good standing in other states. Counsel are not residents of California, are not regularly employed in the State of California, and are not engaged in substantial business, professional or other activities in the State of California. Counsel have not applied to appear pro hac vice in California in the last two years. Counsel are associated with Plaintiffs’ current counsel of record, who is licensed to practice in California. Counsel have served this application on the State Bar of California at its San Francisco office, and paid the $50 fee. Based on the foregoing, admission of Counsel pro hac vice to appear as counsel of record for Plaintiffs is appropriate.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Plaintiffs’ motions are granted. Plaintiff shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 17, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC693876    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

david true, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

layton capital corp., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC693876

Hearing Date: December 5, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motions to be admitted pro hac vice

Attorneys Jacob Karam, Jason Itkin, and Cory Itkin move to be admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs David True and Gabriella True (“Plaintiffs”). Plaintiffs gave notice of this motion on November 13, 2019 by mail. That is not adequate notice. (See Code Civ. Proc., § 1005, subd. (b).) Accordingly, the Court continues the motions to December 17, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. to afford sufficient notice. Plaintiffs shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 2, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAXON INDUSTRIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE CHRISTOPHER A