This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 12:39:19 (UTC).

DAVID TINEO VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 DAVID TINEO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2171

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TINEO DAVID

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NGUYEN ATHENA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

6/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/15/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David Tineo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Tineo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by David Tineo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Tineo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NGUYEN ATHENA