This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2020 at 03:54:29 (UTC).

DAVID TILEM VS KIMBERLY BIRBROWER

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 DAVID TILEM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KIMBERLY BIRBROWER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0257

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TILEM DAVID DBA LAW OFFICES OF DAVID A. TILEM

Defendant

BIRBROWER KIMBERLY AKA KIMBERLY BONHEIM BIRBROWER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDSMAN PHILIP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/5/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

7/5/2019: Case Management Statement

Exhibit List

7/5/2019: Exhibit List

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

7/5/2019: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/5/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

7/5/2019: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/22/2019

7/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/22/2019

Default Judgment

7/29/2019: Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/28/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

5/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/27/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/27/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/27/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/27/2019: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketJudgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 07/30/2019 entered for Plaintiff DAVID TILEM DBA LAW OFFICES OF DAVID A. TILEM against Defendant KIMBERLY BIRBROWER AKA KIMBERLY BONHEIM BIRBROWER.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by DAVID TILEM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Docketat 2:39 PM in Department B; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by DAVID TILEM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by DAVID TILEM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DAVID TILEM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by DAVID TILEM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DAVID TILEM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by DAVID TILEM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DAVID TILEM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DAVID TILEM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DAVID TILEM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less