This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 11:19:12 (UTC).

DAVID SOTELO, ET AL. VS FCA US, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 DAVID SOTELO, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0289

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOTELO DAVID

SOTELO ELSA

Defendants

FCA US LLC

KNIGHT CLAREMONT CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA GRACE

Defendant Attorney

HUGRET SPENCER

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/31/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/31/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

3/3/2023: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE (DATES REMAIN)

3/3/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE (DATES REMAIN)

Answer

3/3/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • Hearing06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department L at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Knight Claremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram (Defendant); As to: Elsa Sotelo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); As to: Elsa Sotelo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice (Dates Remain); Filed by: David Sotelo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department L - Hon. Wesley L. Hsueffective 03/02/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: David Sotelo (Plaintiff); As to: Knight Claremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram (Defendant); Service Date: 02/02/2023; Service Cost: 88.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: David Sotelo (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 01/31/2023; Service Cost: 34.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department L Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: David Sotelo (Plaintiff); Elsa Sotelo (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); Knight Claremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: David Sotelo (Plaintiff); Elsa Sotelo (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); Knight Claremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: David Sotelo (Plaintiff); Elsa Sotelo (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); Knight Claremont Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less