This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 06:14:45 (UTC).

DAVID S. YATES VS TEODORAS A. SKIRGAILA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 DAVID S YATES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TEODORAS A SKIRGAILA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6893

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YATES DAVID S.

Defendants

SKIRGAILA TEODORAS A. AKA TED SKY

TEODORAS A. SKIRGAILA GENERAL PARTNER FOR TALKA LTD A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

TEODORAS ALGIMANTAS SKIRGAILA TRUSTEE FOR TEODORAS A. SKIRGAILA AND GIEDRA SKIRGAILA TRUST AKA T AND G TRUST

RIFE LAWRENCE

SKIRGAILA GIEDRA AKA T AND G TRUST

RIFE LAWRANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HEATHCOTE TAMARA MAE

CARTER KATHLEEN MARY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DAVID S. YATES, REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

2/6/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DAVID S. YATES, REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Request - Request for Telephonic Appearance

2/14/2020: Request - Request for Telephonic Appearance

Proof of Service by Mail

2/18/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Opposition - Opposition to Motion to Compel the Deposition of David Yates, Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Sanctions and Costs

2/18/2020: Opposition - Opposition to Motion to Compel the Deposition of David Yates, Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Sanctions and Costs

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TIFFANY Y. GRUENBERG IN SUPPORT OF REPLY

2/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TIFFANY Y. GRUENBERG IN SUPPORT OF REPLY

Request for Judicial Notice

2/27/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Exhibit List

2/27/2020: Exhibit List

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ATTEND DEPOSITION AND PAY $1,215.00 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL

2/27/2020: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ATTEND DEPOSITION AND PAY $1,215.00 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; CASE REFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 1 F...)

3/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; CASE REFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 1 F...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; CASE REFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 1 F...) OF 03/03/2020

3/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; CASE REFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 1 F...) OF 03/03/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY THE DEFENDANT, COMPELLIN...)

3/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY THE DEFENDANT, COMPELLIN...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 1 FOR REVIEW AND ...) OF 03/11/2020

3/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 1 FOR REVIEW AND ...) OF 03/11/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 1 FOR REVIEW AND ...)

3/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 1 FOR REVIEW AND ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

3/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 03/13/2020

3/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 03/13/2020

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/27/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

6/8/2020: Case Management Statement

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 74; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Non-Appearance Case Review (re dismissal of unserved/unnamed Does) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Following Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Teodoras A. Skirgaila (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docketat 3:12 PM in Department 74; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 07/22/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by David S. Yates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration re: Good Faith Attempt to Meet and Confer and 30 Day Extension to Respond to Third Amended Complaint); Filed by Teodoras A. Skirgaila (Defendant); Teodoras A. Skirgaila General Partner For Talka LTD a California General Partnership (Defendant); Teodoras Algimantas Skirgaila Trustee for Teodoras A. Skirgaila and Giedra Skirgaila Trust (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David S. Yates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David S. Yates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by D S Y (Plaintiff); David S. Yates (Plaintiff); D S Y (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by D S Y (Plaintiff); David S. Yates (Plaintiff); D S Y (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6893    Hearing Date: March 06, 2020    Dept: 29

*******6893 Yates v. Skirgaila, et al.

Case Referred to Department 1 for Review and Possible Reassignment to an Independent Calendar ("IC") Court.

The Court having reviewed the legal file determines that the above entitled-action was erroneously filed as a personal injury (“PI”) matter.

The Court orders this action referred to the Master Calendar Department, Department 1 for review and determination as to whether this case should be reassigned to an IC Court.

All hearings currently set in Department 29 of the Spring Street courthouse are taken off calendar subject to being reset and notification by the receiving court at the direction of Department 1 Re: New hearing dates.

Upon receipt of this notice, Plaintiff is ordered to give notice to all parties of record.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEATHCOTE TAMARA M. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUSHI CARTER, KATHLEEN MARY