This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2023 at 06:24:43 (UTC).

DAVID RUELAS VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 DAVID RUELAS filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1453

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUELAS DAVID

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO MARK

Defendant Attorney

INGOLD TREVOR

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint - COMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEVERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT

12/8/2022: Complaint - COMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEVERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

12/20/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Proof of Personal Service

12/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

1/13/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

3/20/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/20/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/23/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/23/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

4/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

4/7/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 04/07/2023

4/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 04/07/2023

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2024
  • Hearing09/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2024
  • Hearing09/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 09/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 04/07/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: David Ruelas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER: Filed By: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 04/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: David Ruelas (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEVERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT; Filed by: David Ruelas (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: David Ruelas (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less