This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2021 at 07:09:08 (UTC).

DAVID RODY VS 3M COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 DAVID RODY filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4675

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODY DAVID

Defendants

3M COMPANY AKA MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY

ABC INC.

ALTMAN EQUIPMENT LLC

ALTMAN LIGHTING INC.

ALTMAN RENTALS INC.

ALTMAN STAGE LIGHTING CO. INC. DBA ALTMAN LIGHTING INC.

AMERICAN INSULATED WIRE CORPORATION AKA LEVITON MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC.

ARNOLD SHAPIRO PRODUCTIONS INC.

ARRI INC.

AVON PRODUCTS INC.

BALLANTYNE STRONG INC.

BARBIZON ELECTRIC CO. INC. DBA BARBIZON ELECTRIC COMPANY

BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC FKA BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC FKA MSD CONSUMER CARE INC.

BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC

BELDEN INC.

BEN NYE CO. INC.

BICC CABLES CORPORATION

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC.

61 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PURDY STUART J.

AMELL DAVID LEE

Defendant Attorneys

GAGE NICOLE E.

PARKER JAMES CARL

RAMSEY LAWRENCE ROBERT

RIDLEY SHAWN M.

SHAFFER D SCOTT

CHUSID BRUCE G.

DUFFY JOSEPH

AMEELE KEITH M.

NICHOLS STEPHEN MATTHEW

BARBER STEVEN J.

BROSAMLE ANTHONY DEAN

GARRATT JUSTIN E.

GOLODNITSKA VALERIA

KAPLAN BRADLEY P.

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

LONG JAYME C

MORTL ANDREW T.

MURRIN CHARLES PATRICK

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS BARBIZON ELECTRIC CO., INC.'S AND ZGS INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

10/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS BARBIZON ELECTRIC CO., INC.'S AND ZGS INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/19/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/19/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

9/17/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CSR: IRENE KUBERT/ #10105

10/6/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CSR: IRENE KUBERT/ #10105

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PER...)

10/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PER...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/14/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

7/27/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Reply - REPLY REPLY

9/29/2021: Reply - REPLY REPLY

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION

9/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION

Objection - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS BARBIZON ELECTRIC CO., INC.'S AND ZGS INC.'S NEW EVIDENCE SUBMITTED ON REPLY

9/30/2021: Objection - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS BARBIZON ELECTRIC CO., INC.'S AND ZGS INC.'S NEW EVIDENCE SUBMITTED ON REPLY

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL

8/19/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN HUANG IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

8/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN HUANG IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

8/19/2021: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JULIANA SALFITI IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

8/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JULIANA SALFITI IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND/OR DEMURRER TO EACH CAUSE OF ACTION THEREIN

8/26/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND/OR DEMURRER TO EACH CAUSE OF ACTION THEREIN

209 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • Hearing12/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by David Rody (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling Re: Defendants Barbizon Electric Co., Inc.'s and ZGs Inc.'s Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction); Filed by David Rody (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Stuart J. Purdy (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Stuart J. Purdy (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Altman Stage Lighting Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing - Other (on Demurrer of Defendants, Starz Acquisition LLC and Starz Entertainment LLC, to Plaintiff's Complaint (Rody-21STCV24675)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons (for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction for Specially Appearing Defendants Barbizon Electric Co., Inc. and ZGS Inc. (Rody-21STCV24675)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons (for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction for Specially Appearing Defendant Brenntag North America Inc. (Rody-21STCV24675)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
205 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by David Rody (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by David Rody (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof Of Service Summons; Filed by David Rody (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service to vendor; Filed by David Rody (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by David Rody (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Cable Industries, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Rody (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Rody (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTMAN STAGE LIGHTING CO. INC. DBA ALTMAN LIGHTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ARRI INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BICC CABLES CORP. is a litigant