This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 01:00:38 (UTC).

DAVID RODRIGUEZ VS BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION;

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 DAVID RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0260

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ DAVID

Defendant

BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/4/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • Hearing04/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by David Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN