This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2020 at 07:24:55 (UTC).

DAVID RAMOS, ET AL. VS LEONOR VALDIVIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 DAVID RAMOS filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LEONOR VALDIVIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1550

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAMOS TERESA

RAMOS DAVID

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VALDIVIA RAUL

VALDIVIA LEONOR

VILDOSO MIGUEL

VILDOSO DOE 1 MIGUEL

Cross Defendants

ROES DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

VILDOSO MIGUEL

VILDOSO DOE 1 MIGUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DANOFF EDWARD R

DANOFF EDWARD RICHARD ESQ.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

RIVERA VIVIAN ISABEL

TEREHOVA EVEGENIA

MACKEY ROBERT THOMAS

PHILLIPS THOMAS M.

PHILLIPS THOMAS MILES ESQ.

WOOD CARY L.

WOOD CARY LINN ESQ.

RIVERA VIVIAN ISABEL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES FIL...)

11/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES FIL...)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

10/21/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Substitution of Attorney

10/22/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Motion for Summary Judgment

10/14/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice - NOTICE SEPARATELY BOUND EVIDENCE

10/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE SEPARATELY BOUND EVIDENCE

Request for Judicial Notice

10/14/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Separate Statement

10/14/2020: Separate Statement

Substitution of Attorney

9/10/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Association of Attorney

8/6/2020: Association of Attorney

Association of Attorney

5/21/2020: Association of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/1/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/21/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

10/8/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

10/8/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/25/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/20/2019: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/16/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/16/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • Hearing05/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Hearing05/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Hearing03/25/2021 at 13:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Rescheduling Hearing on Defendant and Cross-complainant Raul Valdivia?s Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by RAUL VALDIVIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by RAUL VALDIVIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial (and All Related Dates. Filed by Defendant/Cross-Complainant, Raul Valdivia) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial and All Related Dates Fil...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by RAUL VALDIVIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial Date (and All Related Dated); Filed by RAUL VALDIVIA (Cross-Complainant); RAUL VALDIVIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by LEONOR VALDIVIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by LEONOR VALDIVIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by LEONOR VALDIVIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by LEONOR VALDIVIA (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by TERESA RAMOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TERESA RAMOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DAVID RAMOS (Plaintiff); TERESA RAMOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DAVID RAMOS (Plaintiff); TERESA RAMOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DAVID RAMOS (Plaintiff); TERESA RAMOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV01550    Hearing Date: November 13, 2020    Dept: 29

Ramos, et al  vs  Valdivia, et al     Case No. 19STCV01550

The Motion to Continue Trial and All Related Dates, filed by Defendant/Cross-Complainant Raul Valdivia on 10/21/2020 is Granted.

The Court orders the Final Status Conference continued to the dates and times as indicated below:

- Final Status Conference continued to 05/02/2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse.

- Jury Trial is continued to 05/16/2022 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse.

Discovery (including exchange of expert information) and motion cut off dates based on new trial date.

Moving Party is ordered to give notice.