This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2020 at 10:54:05 (UTC).

DAVID R. YARDLEY VS MARY MACLIN GUERARD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 DAVID R YARDLEY filed an Other lawsuit against MARY MACLIN GUERARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS, JON R. TAKASUGI and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5496

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YARDLEY DAVID R.

Defendants

GUERARD MARY MACLIN

WION JONATHAN

WION PETER RALPH

WION PETER RALPH AKA PETER R. WILON INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE PETER R. WION REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

NINI GUERARD ACUPUNCTURE AND HEALING CLINIC

WION JONATHAN PAUL AKA JOHN P. WION INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JONATHAN PAUL WION LIVING TRUST

STIBAL DOE 1 VIANNA

THETA HEALING INSTITUTE OF KNOWLEDGE DOE 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

GREENBERG MITCHELL BRUCE

YARDLEY DAVID RULE

HEDRICK KRISTI KELLY

COVARRUBIAS NATASHA

ULLOA EDWARD R.

WODYNSKI MICHELLE

WODYNSKI MICHELLE LEIGH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/8/2020: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF DEPOSITION COMPLETION DATE

10/31/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF DEPOSITION COMPLETION DATE

Request for Refund / Order

9/25/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Answer

9/13/2019: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, AND MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT

8/21/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, AND MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT

Separate Statement

8/15/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID R. YARDLEY, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

8/6/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID R. YARDLEY, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

Case Management Order

6/14/2019: Case Management Order

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

6/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Case Management Statement

5/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

5/28/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

3/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

5/7/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

5/7/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Declaration - DECLARATION DAVID R. YARDLEYS NOTICE OF EXPARTE APPLICATION AN ORDER SETTING A HEARING PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE PROCEDURE ON GROUNDS THAT DEFENDANT MARY NINI MACLIN GUERARD LACKS THE CAPAC

5/7/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DAVID R. YARDLEYS NOTICE OF EXPARTE APPLICATION AN ORDER SETTING A HEARING PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE PROCEDURE ON GROUNDS THAT DEFENDANT MARY NINI MACLIN GUERARD LACKS THE CAPAC

Answer

11/19/2018: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service Of Summons

12/14/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service Of Summons

Complaint

11/19/2018: Complaint

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Mary Maclin Guerard (Defendant); Nini Guerard Acupuncture and Healing Clinic (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by David R. Yardley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (by Defendants Nini Guerard Acupuncture and Healing Clinic and Mary "Nini" Maclin Guerard) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR DEFENDANTS NINI GUERARD ACUPUNCTURE AND HEALING CLINIC AND MARY ?NINI? MACLIN GUERARD?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES); Filed by Mary Maclin Guerard (Defendant); Nini Guerard Acupuncture and Healing Clinic (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (by Defendants Nini Guerard Acupuncture and Healing Clinic and Mary "Nini" Maclin Gueard) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Continuance of Motion for Summary Adjudication); Filed by Mary Maclin Guerard (Defendant); Nini Guerard Acupuncture and Healing Clinic (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Re Extension of Deposition Completion Date); Filed by David R. Yardley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by David R. Yardley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Vianna Stibal (Doe 1) (Defendant); Theta Healing Institute of Knowledge (Doe 2) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David R. Yardley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David R. Yardley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by David R. Yardley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (Of Summons); Filed by David R. Yardley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David R. Yardley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David R. Yardley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketAffidavit (of Reasonable Diligence); Filed by David R. Yardley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities (ISO Demurrer to Complaint); Filed by David R. Yardley (Plaintiff); Jonathan Paul Wion (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENBERG MITCHELL B. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YARDLEY DAVID R. ESQ.