This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2020 at 21:48:46 (UTC).

DAVID R. FETT LIVING TRUST DATED 11/3/14, AS AMENDED

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 DAVID R FETT LIVING TRUST DATED 11/3/14, AS AMENDED was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SMALL, MICHAEL and BARRY, WILLIAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7847

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SMALL, MICHAEL

BARRY, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Petitioners

FETT JESSICA

FETT SAMANTHA

FETT ARIELLA

FETT ERIC

Respondent

FETT SABRINA

Not Classified By Court

GOSS KENT

MITCHELL BURTON A. ESQ

DETOLEDO PHIL

DAVID R. FETT LIVING TRUST

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Guardian Ad Litem

LEVINE RANDI

Other

HENRY SABRINA

Trustee

CITY NATIONAL BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LAWSON DOUGLAS E.

SACKS ROBERT NEIL

Respondent Attorney

RUMMEL BLAKE ALEXANDRA

Trustee and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

DESURRA DESIREE

ERICKSON NEIL CRAIG

 

Court Documents

Order - Approving Settlement Agreement

1/21/2020: Order - Approving Settlement Agreement

Minute Order

7/23/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/23/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/23/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/23/2019: Minute Order

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL GENERAL RELEASE

5/3/2019: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL GENERAL RELEASE

Notice - Hearing

5/7/2019: Notice - Hearing

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Instructions re Trustor's Intent that Sub-Trust Funds Be Used to Construct Residence

8/21/2018: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Instructions re Trustor's Intent that Sub-Trust Funds Be Used to Construct Residence

Notice - Hearing

9/7/2018: Notice - Hearing

Objection - Trust Petition - Response to Petition for Instructions

10/11/2018: Objection - Trust Petition - Response to Petition for Instructions

Declaration - Declaration

10/11/2018: Declaration - Declaration

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Petition for Instructions

10/11/2018: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Petition for Instructions

Notice - Hearing

10/12/2018: Notice - Hearing

Objection - Trust Petition - Response and Objections to Petition for Instructions

10/24/2018: Objection - Trust Petition - Response and Objections to Petition for Instructions

Minute Order

10/31/2018: Minute Order

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

12/28/2018: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Supplement - Trustee City National Bank's Supplement to Response to Petition for Instructions Re Trustor's Intent that Sub-Trust Funds be Used to Construct Residence Re Probate Notes

12/28/2018: Supplement - Trustee City National Bank's Supplement to Response to Petition for Instructions Re Trustor's Intent that Sub-Trust Funds be Used to Construct Residence Re Probate Notes

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

1/4/2019: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketOrder (Approving Settlement Agreement )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Status Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) (Petition for Instructions ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration ); Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketObjection - Trust Petition (Response to Petition for Instructions ); Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Instructions re Trustor's Intent that Sub-Trust Funds Be Used to Construct Residence ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUMMEL BLAKE ALEXANDRA