This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2021 at 20:02:00 (UTC).

DAVID R. ESTRADA, ET AL. VS CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 DAVID R ESTRADA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3279

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTRADA DAVID R.

ESTRADA MARIE

Defendants

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD

VALLEY PIPE & SUPPLY INC.

WESTERN WATER WORKS SUPPLY COMPANY

MORSCO INC. FKA MSC HOLDINGS INC.

CALAVERAS NATURAL RESOURCES INC.

MORSCO SUPPLY LLC FKA MORRISON SUPPLY COMPANY DBA MORRISON SUPPLY COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

FAMILIAN CORPORATION FKA FAMILIAN PIPE AND SUPPLY AS ALTER-EGO TO FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

KEENAN PROPERTIES INC. FKA KEENAN PIPE T SUPPLY COMPANY FKA KEENAN SUPPLY INC.

GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY

SAN GABRIEL VALLEY WATER COMPANY

THE HONGKONG SHANGHAI BANKING CORPORATION LIMITED

WESTBURN SUPPLY INC.

MS2G INC.

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC FKA FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC. SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO WESTBURNE SUPPLY INC. SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GARDEN GROVE PIPE & SUPPLLY RIVERSIDE PIPE & SUPPLY EL CENTRO PIPE & SUPPLY WESTERN PLUMBING SUPPL

GENCO CORPORATION FKA C.D. CENTER COMPANY

HAJOCA CORPORATION

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOEW KEVIN MATHEW

CARON JOHN MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • Hearing11/17/2021 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Status Conference ((Waters, Kraus & Paul)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (Waters, Kraus & Paul))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 02/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotification of Death and Automatic Stay; Filed by David R. Estrada (Plaintiff); Marie Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David R. Estrada (Plaintiff); Marie Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David R. Estrada (Plaintiff); Marie Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENCO CORPORATION FKA C.D. CENTER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE HONGKONG SHANGHAI BANKING CORPORATION LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where MORSCO INC. FKA MSC HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN WATER WORKS SUPPLY COMPANY is a litigant