This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 10:44:33 (UTC).

DAVID PERKINS VS RIEDEL COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 DAVID PERKINS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RIEDEL COMMUNICATIONS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4859

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERKINS DAVID

Defendant

RIEDEL COMMUNICATIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANUKYAN EDGAR

Defendant Attorney

FINK KEITH A

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/1/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

12/19/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

2/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/14/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/16/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

3/7/2023: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by David Perkins on 11/01/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by David Perkins as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference (Further) scheduled for 03/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (3-5 day estimate) scheduled for 08/05/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: David Perkins (Plaintiff); As to: Riedel Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (3-5 day estimate) scheduled for 08/05/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference (Further) scheduled for 03/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 03/01/2023; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 17 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: David Perkins (Plaintiff); As to: Riedel Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: David Perkins (Plaintiff); As to: Riedel Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: David Perkins (Plaintiff); As to: Riedel Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less