Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 00:32:56 (UTC).

DAVID NETKA VS YAGMAI VIDA KYAS TRUST ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/24/2017 DAVID NETKA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YAGMAI VIDA KYAS TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5404

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NETKA DAVID

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

YAGMAI VIDA/KYAS TRUST

DOES 1 TO 100

RT ABOTT CONSTRUCTION INC

Cross Defendants

ROES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

J.V. MCBURNEY CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CARR SCOTT H. ESQ.

CARR SCOTT HARMON

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

O'BRIEN JILLISA L. ESQ.

VANIS RICHARD WILLIAM JR

O'BRIEN JILLISA L

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MCELROY CONOR

 

Court Documents

ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES

7/13/2018: ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES

Substitution of Attorney

12/6/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Motion in Limine

1/15/2019: Motion in Limine

Notice

1/15/2019: Notice

Unknown

1/18/2019: Unknown

Opposition

3/29/2019: Opposition

Opposition

4/3/2019: Opposition

Witness List

4/4/2019: Witness List

Cross-Complaint

4/11/2019: Cross-Complaint

Summons

4/12/2019: Summons

Ex Parte Application

4/22/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

4/22/2019: Minute Order

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES

7/13/2018: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENT 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

3/24/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENT 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/28/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEFENDANT R.T. ABBOTT CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/20/2017: DEFENDANT R.T. ABBOTT CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by RT Abott Construction Inc (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( for Leave to File its Cross-Complaint and Continue Trial for 90 Days; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Jillisa L Obrien in Support Thereof) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by RT Abott Construction Inc (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte -- RT Abbott Construction Inc Ex Parte Application for Leave to File its Cross-Complaint and Continue Trial for 90 Days; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Jillisa L Obrien in Support Thereof); Filed by RT Abott Construction Inc (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Defendant R. T. Abbott Construction, Inc.'s Ex Pa...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Summons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by RT Abott Construction Inc (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by RT Abott Construction Inc (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Witness List; Filed by David Netka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2017
  • Answer; Filed by RT Abott Construction Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DEFENDANT R.T. ABBOTT CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by David Netka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by David Netka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENT 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by David Netka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC655404    Hearing Date: April 6, 2021    Dept: 28

The court would like to hear argument as to whether the subject claim is alleged to arise out of the Scope of Work of each of the cross-defendants.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.V. MCBURNEY CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RT ABBOTT CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCELROY CONOR