This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2021 at 20:17:44 (UTC).

DAVID MOCH VS INC. AGAM PROPERTIES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 DAVID MOCH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INC AGAM PROPERTIES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9511

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOCH DAVID

Defendants

AGAM PROPERTIES INC.

PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC.

MONEY USA

PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC .

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCNAB CECIL RANDOLPH

Defendant Attorney

MAROOTIAN SHARICE B

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

7/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

7/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE;)

7/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF DAVID MOCHS MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET NO.1 PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC FIRST NATIONAL, INC.;

5/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF DAVID MOCHS MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET NO.1 PROPOUNDED TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC FIRST NATIONAL, INC.;

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

6/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Order - ORDER OF DISMISSAL

1/7/2021: Order - ORDER OF DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE;)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES;)

4/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES;)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

4/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC);)

4/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC);)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL O...)

1/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL O...)

Separate Statement

10/19/2020: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

10/19/2020: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/19/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/19/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT MONEY US...)

10/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT MONEY US...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT MONEY US...)

7/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT MONEY US...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • Hearing09/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Hearing09/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Hearing09/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Cancellation of Informal Discovery Conference); Filed by David Moch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by David Moch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Agam Properties, Inc. (Defendant); Pacifica First National, Inc . (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Agam Properties, Inc. (Defendant); Pacifica First National, Inc . (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by David Moch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Pendency of Action); Filed by David Moch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Moch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Moch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by David Moch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONEY USA is a litigant

Latest cases where AGAM PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNAB CECIL RANDOLPH