This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 01:12:24 (UTC).

DAVID MIZRAHI VS MIGUEL ANGEL VERA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2017 DAVID MIZRAHI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MIGUEL ANGEL VERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5801

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIZRAHI DAVID

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DELIVERY OUTSOURCING LLC

US DELIVERY & WAREHOUSING INC

VERA MIGUEL ANGEL

WOLFINGTON SEAN

RED DELIVERY GUY INC

DOES 1-50

DELIVERY OUTSOURCING LLCCMPLT

Defendants and Respondents

DELIVERY OUTSOURCING LLC

US DELIVERY & WAREHOUSING INC

VERA MIGUEL ANGEL

WOLFINGTON SEAN

RED DELIVERY GUY INC

DOES 1-50

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

DELIVERY OUTSOURCING LLCCMPLT

Not Classified By Court

INTERVENER STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AS LIABILITY INSURER OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT US DELIVERY & WAREHOUSING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MCNICHOLAS & MCNICHOLAS LLP

ALEXANDROFF NICHOLAS SIMON

Defendant Attorneys

MACDONALD SCOTT L.

HAWKINS MARC W.

SHAVER THOMAS W. ESQ.

O'CONNOR COZEN

LAW OFFICES OF MARC W. HAWKINS

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application

10/18/2018: Ex Parte Application

Declaration

1/8/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

1/10/2019: Minute Order

Order

1/10/2019: Order

Notice

5/14/2019: Notice

Ex Parte Application

5/22/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

5/22/2019: Minute Order

Motion for Leave to Intervene

6/7/2019: Motion for Leave to Intervene

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Motion for Leave to Intervene; Filed by US Delivery & Warehousing, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue (Motion to Continue Trial) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and related motions and discovery dates) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and related motions and discovery dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial and related...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (DEFENDANT SEAN WOLFINGTON'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL [AND RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY DATES]; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATIONS OF DEBRA L BRAASCH AND SEAN WOLFINGTON; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON;); Filed by Sean Wolfington (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Order (GRANTING DEFENDANT SEAN WOLFINGTON'S EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL RELATED TRIAL DATES); Filed by Sean Wolfington (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue (Motion to Continue Trial) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Notice (NOTICE OF AMENDED MOTION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY TO INTERVENE); Filed by US Delivery & Warehousing, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY); Filed by US Delivery & Warehousing, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by David Mizrahi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by David Mizrahi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE JURY TRIAL DEMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by David Mizrahi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Sean Wolfington (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

ORIGINAL

U\-hbJN’—:

COZEN O’CONNOR

601 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3700 DEC 06 2017

Los Angeles, CA 90017 o _ - L ‘Telephone: 213.892.7900 herei Rovgrier Exectthos R r(eri Facsimile: 213.892.7999 By L. depaty,

" GloTterin Ketnus o, Attorney for Defendant/Cross-Defendant

SEAN WOLFINGTON SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES — CENTRAL DISTRICT

CASE NO.: BC645801 FAXED

[Assigned for all purposes to Hon. Marc Gross, Department 92]

DAVID MIZRAHI, an individual,

ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT SEAN WOLFINGTON TO MIGUEL ANGEL VERA’S CROSS COMPLAINT [FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH CROSS-COMPLAINT]

MIGUEL ANGEL VERA, an individual; SEAN WOLFINGTON, an individual; U.S. DELIVERY & WAREHOUSING, INC,, a corporation, RED DELIVERY GUY, INC., a corporation: DELIVERY OUTSOURCING, LLC, a limited liability company; and DOES 1 through 50, inclusive,

Complaint Filed: January 5, 2017