This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 07:16:56 (UTC).

DAVID MENDOZA VS CAROLINE KASSEL

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 DAVID MENDOZA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CAROLINE KASSEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1830

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID MENDOZA

MENDOZA DAVID

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

CAROLINE KASSEL AN NDIVIDUAL

KASSEL CAROLINE

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

CHICAGO TITLE

MENDOZA DAVID

SHOWFX

MENDOZA STEPHANIE

ESCROW SPECTRUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OVANDO BOWEN LLP

OVANDO SARA NINETH

Cross Defendant Attorney

BOWEN CHUMAHAN

 

Court Documents

Order

6/4/2018: Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/4/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

General Denial

7/17/2018: General Denial

Declaration

9/7/2018: Declaration

Case Management Statement

10/17/2018: Case Management Statement

Reply

1/3/2019: Reply

Proof of Personal Service

2/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/1/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demurrer

3/1/2019: Demurrer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/1/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/15/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/16/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

4/23/2019: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

4/29/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice

5/14/2019: Notice

Notice

5/15/2019: Notice

Declaration

6/13/2019: Declaration

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/17/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Motion to Compel (PLAINTIFF DAVID MENDOZA?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM THE TRUTH OF MATTERS AND GENUINENESS OF DOCUMENTS SPECIFIED IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET TWO, ADMITTED AND CONCLUSIVELY ESTABLISHED; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINS); Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Declaration (DECLARATION OF CHUMAHAN BOWEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SET ONE FROM DEFENDANT CAROLINE KASSEL; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT CAROLINE KASSEL); Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Declaration (DECLARATION OF CHUMAHAN BOWEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING THE TRUTH OF MATTERS IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS SET TWO ADMITTED AND CONCLUSIVELY ESTABLISHED); Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Motion to Compel (PLAINTIFF DAVID MENDOZA?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; AND REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT CAROLINE KASSEL); Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Declaration (DECLARATION OF CHUMAHAN BOWEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION); Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Motion to Compel (PLAINTIFF DAVID MENDOZA?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET ONE FROM DEFENDANT CAROLINE KASSEL; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT CAROLINE KASSEL); Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • General Denial; Filed by Caroline Kassel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Summons; Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Order (To Show Cause Hearing); Filed by David Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHOWFX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOWEN CHUMAHAN