Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 04:54:35 (UTC).

DAVID MANZOOR VS BLU MAGIC MUSIC LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 DAVID MANZOOR filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against BLU MAGIC MUSIC LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0837

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MANZOOR DAVID

Defendants and Respondents

RASHID JAMAL

RASHAD JAMAL

MALL MALLY

MALL RASHID

MALLY MALL MUSIC LLC

BLU MAGIC MUSIC LLC

FUTRUE MUSIC LLC

RASHID JAMAL F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

COLCLOUGH ROBERT J. III ESQ.

ENAV LYRIC

LINZER KENNETH A. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

TREYZON BORIS

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

4/23/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice

4/25/2019: Notice

Unknown

1/4/2018: Unknown

JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 1710.25)

1/4/2018: JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 1710.25)

AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT AND ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION OR OTHER ENFORCEMENT

1/4/2018: AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT AND ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION OR OTHER ENFORCEMENT

JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (CODE CIV. PROC., 1710.25)

1/4/2018: JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (CODE CIV. PROC., 1710.25)

Unknown

5/10/2018: Unknown

Proof of Service

5/10/2018: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

5/10/2018: Proof of Service

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

7/9/2018: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT

7/30/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT

ORDER ON LX PA1TE APPLICATION OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR THE COURT TO SPECIALLY SET THE DATE FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S OCTOBER 23, 2018 HEARING ON HIS MOTION FOR AN ASSIGNMENT ORDER TO AN EARLIER DATE

8/3/2018: ORDER ON LX PA1TE APPLICATION OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR THE COURT TO SPECIALLY SET THE DATE FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S OCTOBER 23, 2018 HEARING ON HIS MOTION FOR AN ASSIGNMENT ORDER TO AN EARLIER DATE

DECLARATION OF DAVID MANZOOR, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/3/2018: DECLARATION OF DAVID MANZOOR, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

EX PARTE APPLICATION OF JUDGMENT CRFI)ITOR DAVID MANZOOR FOR THE COURT TO SPECIFICALLY SET THE DATE FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S OCTOBER 23, 2018 HEARING ON HIS MOTION FOR AN ASSIGNMENT ORDER TO AN EARLIER

8/3/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF JUDGMENT CRFI)ITOR DAVID MANZOOR FOR THE COURT TO SPECIFICALLY SET THE DATE FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S OCTOBER 23, 2018 HEARING ON HIS MOTION FOR AN ASSIGNMENT ORDER TO AN EARLIER

Minute Order

8/3/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT DEBTORS' OPPOSITION TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S MOTION FOR A POST-JUDGMENT ASSIGNMENT ORDER, TURNOVER ORDERS, AND ORDER RESTRAINING JUDGMENT DEBTOR FROM INTERFERING WITH A

8/30/2018: NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT DEBTORS' OPPOSITION TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S MOTION FOR A POST-JUDGMENT ASSIGNMENT ORDER, TURNOVER ORDERS, AND ORDER RESTRAINING JUDGMENT DEBTOR FROM INTERFERING WITH A

Minute Order

9/6/2018: Minute Order

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

12/27/2018: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by DAVID MANZOOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Continuance of Judgment Debtor Examination of Rashid Jamal); Filed by DAVID MANZOOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by DAVID MANZOOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Kenneth A. Linzer, Esq. (Attorney); DAVID MANZOOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by DAVID MANZOOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by DAVID MANZOOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for an Order; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2018
  • AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT AND ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION OR OTHER ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Sister State Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by DAVID MANZOOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by DAVID MANZOOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE APP FOR S-SJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BS170837    Hearing Date: April 5, 2021    Dept: 54

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

David Manzoor,

Judgment Creditor,

Case

No.:

BS170837

vs.

Tentative Ruling

Rashid Jamal, et al.,

Judgment Debtors.

Hearing Date: April 5, 2021

Department 54, Judge Anthony Mohr

Motion to Set Aside Order

Moving Party: Judgment Debtor Jamal Rashid

Responding Party: Judgment Creditor David Manzoor

T/R: THE MOTION IS OFF CALENDAR.

JUDGMENT CREDITOR to notice.

The Court considers the moving papers and opposition.

Judgment Debtor Jamal Rashid moves to set aside the Court’s discovery order entered on August 4, 2020. Rashid filed a notice of bankruptcy on January 25, 2021. This action is now subject to an automatic stay per 11 U.S.C. § 362(a). The Court cannot rule on the motion.