This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2019 at 01:19:41 (UTC).

DAVID LEE VS CLINT SOPPE MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/23/2018 DAVID LEE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CLINT SOPPE MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1321

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LEE DAVID

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC

SANTA MONICA ORTHOPAEDIC AND SPORTS

CEDARS-SINAI KERLAN-JOBE INSTITUTE

SOPPE CLINT M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEVINE ERIC D. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

TOMLINSON RODNEY G. ESQ.

GIOVANNIELLO ALEXANDER F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 10/08/2019

10/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 10/08/2019

Order - Dismissal

10/8/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

10/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Motion re: - Motion re: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

3/7/2019: Motion re: - Motion re: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Declaration - Declaration Declaration of Helen S. Peltekci in Support of Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

3/7/2019: Declaration - Declaration Declaration of Helen S. Peltekci in Support of Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)

4/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...) OF 04/18/2019

4/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...) OF 04/18/2019

Notice of Ruling

4/22/2019: Notice of Ruling

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/22/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Request for Dismissal

5/29/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE ENTRY OF ORDER RE CONTINAUNCE OF TRIAL, FSC

6/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE ENTRY OF ORDER RE CONTINAUNCE OF TRIAL, FSC

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

6/11/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC

6/11/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/19/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 10/08/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Surgery Center of The Pacific (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by David Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by David Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by David Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1.1 MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS SINAI KERLAN JOBE INSTITUTE A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC LLC RUDY E. GRIMALDO- ADMISISTRATOR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE ERIC D