This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 13:15:42 (UTC).

DAVID KIM VS MOHAMMAD ROUFUL AHSAN

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 DAVID KIM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MOHAMMAD ROUFUL AHSAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6596

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM DAVID

Defendant

AHSAN MOHAMMAD ROUFUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HONG KEVIN HYUNJONG

Defendant Attorney

HILL GEOFFREY T.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/11/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/7/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2024
  • Hearing02/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • Hearing08/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Hearing08/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Mohammad Rouful Ahsan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mohammad Rouful Ahsan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by David Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HONG KEVIN HYUNJONG