This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2023 at 02:42:29 (UTC).

DAVID I. CENTENO RIVERA, ET AL. VS ROBERTO RIVERA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 DAVID I CENTENO RIVERA, filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERTO RIVERA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8097

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CENTENO RIVERA DAVID I.

CENTENO OSCAR E.

Defendants

ONE WEEK BATH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RIVERA ROBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELDMAN RAYMOND ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ANVARI SEPENTA ERIC

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/2/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

8/2/2022: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Motion for Summary Judgment

7/15/2022: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice - NOTICE VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ONE WEEK BATH, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ONE WEEK BATH, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement

7/15/2022: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/10/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/10/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/10/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/10/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/10/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/10/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Proof of Personal Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

7/9/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

7/9/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

PI General Order

6/3/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2024
  • Hearing05/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • Hearing09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • Hearing08/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 04/26/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 02/02/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 04/26/2023 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: DAVID I. CENTENO RIVERA (Plaintiff); OSCAR E. CENTENO (Plaintiff); ROBERTO RIVERA (Defendant); ONE WEEK BATH, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: DAVID I. CENTENO RIVERA (Plaintiff); OSCAR E. CENTENO (Plaintiff); ROBERTO RIVERA (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by: DAVID I. CENTENO RIVERA (Plaintiff); OSCAR E. CENTENO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 11/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08/30/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DAVID I. CENTENO RIVERA (Plaintiff); OSCAR E. CENTENO (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERTO RIVERA (Defendant); ONE WEEK BATH, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DAVID I. CENTENO RIVERA (Plaintiff); OSCAR E. CENTENO (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERTO RIVERA (Defendant); ONE WEEK BATH, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DAVID I. CENTENO RIVERA (Plaintiff); OSCAR E. CENTENO (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERTO RIVERA (Defendant); ONE WEEK BATH, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONE WEEK BATH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANVARI ERIC LAW OFFICES OF