This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 09:08:10 (UTC).

DAVID I.. AN INDIVIDUAL RAINER VS MATTHEW P.. AN INDIVIDUAL WAGNER

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 DAVID I AN INDIVIDUAL RAINER filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against MATTHEW P AN INDIVIDUAL WAGNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9091

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAINER DAVID I.. AN INDIVIDUAL

RAINER DAVID I.

Defendants and Appellants

WAGNER MATTHEW P.

WAGNER MATTHEW P.. AN INDIVIDUAL

Respondent and Plaintiff

RAINER DAVID I.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WOODS SHAUNA

DEIXLER BERT H.

KIM NARY

KIM NARY ESQ.

DEIXLER BERT H. ESQ.

WOODS SHAUNA ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BAUTE MARK DOUGLAS

ROTH BRYAN DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Firm Name

9/28/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/13/2021

8/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

7/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

7/21/2021: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

6/9/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID J. VOLK

6/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID J. VOLK

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID I. RAINER

6/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID I. RAINER

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BERT H. DEIXLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (C.C.P. 425.16)

6/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BERT H. DEIXLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (C.C.P. 425.16)

Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

6/15/2021: Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling

6/22/2021: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2021

4/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2021

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/26/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/19/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION OF B. ROTH ISO DEMURRER TO RAINER COMPLAINT

2/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF B. ROTH ISO DEMURRER TO RAINER COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/23/2020: Complaint

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • Hearing06/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Matthew P. Wagner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA 7/13/21 B313950); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by David I. Rainer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Matthew P. Wagner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Matthew P. Wagner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by David I. Rainer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (David I. Rainer); Filed by David I. Rainer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Minute Order); Filed by David I. Rainer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 37; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Case) of 01/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by David I. Rainer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by David I. Rainer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David I. Rainer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David I. Rainer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROTH BRYAN DANIEL