This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2022 at 10:19:33 (UTC).

DAVID HARUTUNYAN, VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 DAVID HARUTUNYAN, filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9790

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARUTUNYAN DAVID

Defendants

SEMPRA ENERGY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLANCO MARIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/13/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/29/2022

9/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/29/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 09/27/2022

9/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 09/27/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ADD-ON CASE) OF 11/18/2022

11/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ADD-ON CASE) OF 11/18/2022

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/18/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADD-ON CASE)

11/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADD-ON CASE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • Hearing12/13/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Add-on Case) of 11/18/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Add-on Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Status of Any Request for Coordination scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 04:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/29/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 12 - Hon. Carolyn B. Kuhl; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Complex Determination)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: David Harutunyan, (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Gas Company (Defendant); Sempra Energy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: David Harutunyan, (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Gas Company (Defendant); Sempra Energy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: David Harutunyan, (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Gas Company (Defendant); Sempra Energy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant