This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 08:11:50 (UTC).

DAVID GUERRERO VS CABANA CAR WASH INC

Case Summary

On 08/28/2017 DAVID GUERRERO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CABANA CAR WASH INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3844

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

BAUTISTA DAVID

GUERRERO DAVID

GUERRERO DAVID AKA DAVID BAUTISTA

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

CABANA CAR WASH INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

ELIHU KAVEH S. ESQ.

ELIHU KAVEH SAM ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

GREY RICHARD N. ESQ.

GREY RICHARD N. .

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/5/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

2/5/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Proof of Service

6/19/2018: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

6/19/2018: Proof of Service

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND ETC

6/19/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND ETC

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FORM INTERROGATORIES

6/19/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FORM INTERROGATORIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS C

6/19/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS C

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC. FIRST SETS OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND; ETC.

6/19/2018: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC. FIRST SETS OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND; ETC.

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC. FIRST SETS OF FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND; ETC.

6/19/2018: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC. FIRST SETS OF FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND; ETC.

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC.'S PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL AND EMPLOYMENT

6/19/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC.'S PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL AND EMPLOYMENT

Other -

6/19/2018: Other -

Other -

6/19/2018: Other -

Proof of Service

7/9/2018: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC. SECOND SETS OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL OF R

7/9/2018: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC. SECOND SETS OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL OF R

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS AND FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND/OR ITS ATTORNEY RECORD IN THE ANOUNT OF $2,397.5O, ETC

7/9/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS AND FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND/OR ITS ATTORNEY RECORD IN THE ANOUNT OF $2,397.5O, ETC

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC. FIRST SETS OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL OF RECORD PURSUAN

7/9/2018: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC. FIRST SETS OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL OF RECORD PURSUAN

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC. SECOND SETS OF FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL OF RECORD PURSUANT

7/9/2018: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CABANA CAR WASH, INC. SECOND SETS OF FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL OF RECORD PURSUANT

NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF ANY OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS AND FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND/OR ITS ATTORNEY OF RECORD IN THE ANOUNT OF $2,397.50 [MOTION 1 O

9/20/2018: NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF ANY OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS AND FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND/OR ITS ATTORNEY OF RECORD IN THE ANOUNT OF $2,397.50 [MOTION 1 O

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by David Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Jury Trial (7 Day Estimate) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Final Status Conference, Trial, and All Related Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial 7 Day Estimate; Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Ap...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Proposed Order); Filed by David Guerrero (Plaintiff); Cabana Car Wash, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Final Status Conference, Trial, and All Related Dates) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Final...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Final...) of 05/24/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Final Status Conference, Trial, and All Related Dates); Filed by David Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Jury Trial (7 Day Estimate) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by David Guerrero (Plaintiff); David Bautista (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by David Guerrero (Plaintiff); David Bautista (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE 1294O ET SEQ. ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3844    Hearing Date: October 30, 2019    Dept: 48

MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT (CCP ; 664.6)

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff David Guerrero a.k.a. David Bautista

RESPONDING PARTY(S)) No opposition filed.

PROOF OF SERVICE:

ANALYSIS

Motion to Enforce Settlement

Plaintiff David Guerrero a.k.a. David Bautista moves to enforce the parties’ settlement pursuant to CCP ; 664.6. Defendant has failed to make any payments required under the Settlement Agreement.

A copy of the Settlement Agreement, signed by both parties, is attached as Exh. 1 to the Declaration of Daniel J. Friedman. ¶ A of the Settlement Agreement sets forth a payment schedule. Defendant has not made any payments pursuant to the schedule. Friedman Decl., ¶ 3. Accordingly, Plaintiff is entitled to entry of judgment in the sum of $51,000.00.

The motion to enforce settlement pursuant to CCP ; 664.6 is GRANTED.

Pursuant to ¶ P of the Settlement Agreement, the prevailing party on a motion to enforce the Agreement is entitled to reasonable attorney’s fees. Plaintiff’s request for attorney’s fees and costs is GRANTED in the reduced amount of $1,810.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIHU KAVEH SAM