Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2021 at 04:43:04 (UTC).

DAVID, FAYE VS YEHOUNATAN, MATHEW

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 DAVID, FAYE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against YEHOUNATAN, MATHEW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MORDETZKY, MARILYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0648

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MORDETZKY, MARILYN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAVID FAYE

Respondent

YEHOUNATAN MATHEW

 

Court Documents

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

9/18/2020: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Minute Order

9/18/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

8/28/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

8/28/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - CORRECTED ON 8/13/2020 BY C. GOMEZ

8/7/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - CORRECTED ON 8/13/2020 BY C. GOMEZ

Minute Order

8/7/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

8/7/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

8/7/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Proof of Service

7/17/2020: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

7/17/2020: Proof of Service

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

7/17/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

7/17/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/26/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

6/26/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

5/20/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Petition - Civil Harassment

5/20/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Miscellaneous - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

5/20/2020: Miscellaneous - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

5/20/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department K, Mordetzky, Marilyn, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department K, Mordetzky, Marilyn, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department K, Mordetzky, Marilyn, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (CORRECTED ON 8/13/2020 BY C. GOMEZ ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department K, Mordetzky, Marilyn, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less