This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2023 at 06:39:29 (UTC).

DAVID CERVANTES VS POOJA ASWANI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 DAVID CERVANTES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against POOJA ASWANI,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3422

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERVANTES DAVID

Defendants

ASWANI POOJA

BAY MANOJ S JR

MANOJ S. BAY JR. DDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

POOJA ASWANI DDS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POCRASS JAMES LOUIS

Defendant Attorneys

AKITA JERRY S.

KAMEL BRIAN PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Answer

3/20/2023: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/3/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/3/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/3/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

1/3/2023: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/30/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/13/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/13/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/22/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/22/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/22/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/22/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/22/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2025
  • Hearing04/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2023
  • Hearing10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2023
  • Hearing10/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: MANOJ S. BAY, JR. Erroneously Sued As Manoj S Bay, Jr (Defendant); MANOJ S. BAY, JR. Erroneously Sued As Manoj S. Bay, Jr., DDS, Inc. a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: David Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Pooja Aswani, D.D.S. Erroneously Sued As Pooja Aswani (Defendant); Pooja Aswani, DDS, Inc. a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: David Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: David Cervantes (Plaintiff); As to: Pooja Aswani, D.D.S. Erroneously Sued As Pooja Aswani (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/14/2022; Service Cost: 146.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: David Cervantes (Plaintiff); As to: Pooja Aswani, DDS, Inc. a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/14/2022; Service Cost: 186.91; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: David Cervantes (Plaintiff); As to: Pooja Aswani (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/14/2022; Service Cost: 146.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: David Cervantes (Plaintiff); As to: Pooja Aswani, DDS, Inc. a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/16/2022; Service Cost: 146.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: David Cervantes (Plaintiff); As to: Manoj S. Bay, Jr., DDS, Inc. a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/05/2022; Service Cost: 146.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: David Cervantes (Plaintiff); As to: Pooja Aswani (Defendant); Pooja Aswani, DDS, Inc. a California Corporation (Defendant); Manoj S Bay, Jr (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: David Cervantes (Plaintiff); As to: Pooja Aswani (Defendant); Pooja Aswani, DDS, Inc. a California Corporation (Defendant); Manoj S Bay, Jr (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: David Cervantes (Plaintiff); As to: Pooja Aswani (Defendant); Pooja Aswani, DDS, Inc. a California Corporation (Defendant); Manoj S Bay, Jr (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less