This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2020 at 01:45:06 (UTC).

DAVID CASE VS LAS VIRGENES UNIFIED SCHOLL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 10/26/2018 DAVID CASE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LAS VIRGENES UNIFIED SCHOLL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2556

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASE DAVID

Defendants

LAS VIRGENES UNIFIED SCHOLL DISTRICT

LAS VIRGENES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDDELL HOWARD DAVID

Defendant Attorney

DARROLL EILEEN PALMER

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/26/2018: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

12/11/2018: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ...)

7/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ...)

Request for Dismissal

5/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Firm Name

9/27/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER AND PROOF OF SERVICE

7/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR 90 DAYS AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES

7/25/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR 90 DAYS AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR 90 DAYS...)

7/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR 90 DAYS...)

Case Management Statement

1/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Objection - Objection to Evidence inSupport of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complalint

1/25/2019: Objection - Objection to Evidence inSupport of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complalint

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...) of 01/14/2019

1/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...) of 01/14/2019

Declaration - Declaration of Howard Ruddell iso Opposition to Demurrer

1/18/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Howard Ruddell iso Opposition to Demurrer

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/13/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 74; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by David Case (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docketat 2:39 PM in Department 74; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/04/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Eileen P. Darroll in Support of Las Virgenes Unified School District's Demurred to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Las Virgenes Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support Thereof); Filed by Las Virgenes Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurred to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Las Virgenes Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by David Case (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Case (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Case (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAS VIRGENES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruddell, Howard D.