Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 07:33:25 (UTC).

DAVID CAPABLANCA VS WESTSIDE HABITATS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2018 DAVID CAPABLANCA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WESTSIDE HABITATS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DEBRE KATZ WEINTRAUB and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0081

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DEBRE KATZ WEINTRAUB

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPABLANCA DAVID

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendants

XENON INVESTMENT CORP.

WESTSIDE HABITATS LLC

 

Court Documents

Unknown

4/22/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

4/22/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/17/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

1/17/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

12/14/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/30/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown

12/14/2018: Unknown

Summons

10/22/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

10/22/2018: Unknown

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/22/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

10/22/2018: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 04/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why David Capablanca aka David Alexander Capablanca Should Not be Declared a Vexatious Litigant) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why David Capablanca aka David Alexan...) of 01/17/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why David Capablanca aka David Alexan...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order Re Setting an Order to Show Cause Hearing in Depa...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Setting an Order to Show Cause Hearing in Depa...) of 12/14/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by David Capablanca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Capablanca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTSIDE HABITATS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where XENON INVESTMENT CORP. is a litigant