This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2020 at 16:33:10 (UTC).

DAVID BUGENSKE VS MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 DAVID BUGENSKE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1055

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUGENSKE DAVID

Defendants

MT. WILSON FM BROADCASTING INC.

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAMIREZ-GALVEZ DAVID

GLICK GAIL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REFER CASE TO ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION

2/6/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REFER CASE TO ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL SPENCER IN SUPPORT

12/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL SPENCER IN SUPPORT

Declaration - DECLARATION STEPHANIE LEVINE IN SUPPORT

12/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION STEPHANIE LEVINE IN SUPPORT

Motion to Compel Arbitration

12/27/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/3/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/4/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/11/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/14/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/14/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/14/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/14/2019: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by David Bugenske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Refer Case to Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration); Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Defendant); Mt. Wilson FM Broadcasting, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Stephanie Levine in Support); Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Defendant); Mt. Wilson FM Broadcasting, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Daniel Spencer in Support); Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Defendant); Mt. Wilson FM Broadcasting, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Defendant); Mt. Wilson FM Broadcasting, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketNotice (notice of case management conference); Filed by David Bugenske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by David Bugenske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by David Bugenske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Bugenske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by David Bugenske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Bugenske (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLICK GAIL A. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMIREZ-GALVEZ DAVID