This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 00:39:39 (UTC).

DAVID BRYAN BOONE VS TRAVIS RAYSHON MCCLOUD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 DAVID BRYAN BOONE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRAVIS RAYSHON MCCLOUD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3736

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOONE DAVID BRYAN

Defendants

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

MCCLOUD TRAVIS RAYSHON

ENTERPROSE RENT-A-CAR OF LOS ANGELES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVENTHAL STANLEY R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/29/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], PI GENERAL ORDER, STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

2/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], PI GENERAL ORDER, STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

2/6/2020: PI General Order

Request for Dismissal

6/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by David Bryan Boone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], PI General Order, Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Bryan Boone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Bryan Boone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Bryan Boone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by David Bryan Boone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVENTHAL STANLEY R. ESQ.