This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/10/2020 at 00:26:29 (UTC).

DAVID BRIAN SANDERS INTERIOR DESIGN, INC. VS HELLO DARLING CENTURY CITY LLC

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 DAVID BRIAN SANDERS INTERIOR DESIGN, INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against HELLO DARLING CENTURY CITY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1832

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAVID BRIAN SANDERS INTERIOR DESIGN INC.

Respondent

HELLO DARLING CENTURY CITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DECLERCQ WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

2/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

Request for Dismissal

2/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...) OF 02/03/2020

2/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...) OF 02/03/2020

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/21/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/21/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE RELATED)

1/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE RELATED)

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

10/31/2019: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

10/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/3/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

9/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

9/10/2019: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/22/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/10/2019: Petition - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

5/10/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: entry of ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DAVID BRIAN SANDERS INTERIOR DESIGN, INC. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: entry of ...) of 02/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Cases Should Not Be Related) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Cases Should Not Be Related)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by William Declercq (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by William Declercq (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by HELLO DARLING CENTURY CITY LLC (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by DAVID BRIAN SANDERS INTERIOR DESIGN, INC. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by DAVID BRIAN SANDERS INTERIOR DESIGN, INC. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by DAVID BRIAN SANDERS INTERIOR DESIGN, INC. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DAVID BRIAN SANDERS INTERIOR DESIGN, INC. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketPetition (TO COMPEL ARBITRATION); Filed by DAVID BRIAN SANDERS INTERIOR DESIGN, INC. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by DAVID BRIAN SANDERS INTERIOR DESIGN, INC. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DAVID BRIAN SANDERS INTERIOR DESIGN, INC. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVID BRIAN SANDERS INTERIOR DESIGN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECLERCQ WILLIAM