This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2020 at 19:08:01 (UTC).

DAVID ANGELES, ET AL. VS WASTE RESOURCES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 DAVID ANGELES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WASTE RESOURCES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5250

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGELES DAVID

Defendants

WASTE RESOURCES INC.

SHIRVANIAN LINDA

SHIRVANIAN KOSTI

WASTE RESOURCES TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAINES DANIEL FRANKLIN

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/7/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EVAN S. GAINES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS A MATTER OF RIGHT AND DISMISSAL OF CLASS CLAIMS (C.R.C. RULE 3.770)

12/7/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EVAN S. GAINES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS A MATTER OF RIGHT AND DISMISSAL OF CLASS CLAIMS (C.R.C. RULE 3.770)

Initial Status Conference Order

12/7/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

12/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 12/07/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

12/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 12/07/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/25/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • Hearing03/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docketat 09:12 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by David Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Evan S. Gaines in Support of Plaintiff's Filing); Filed by David Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Evan S. Gaines in Support of Plaintiff's Filing of First Amended Complaint as a Matter of Right and Dismissal of Class Claims (C.R.C. Rule 3.770); Filed by David Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case) of 12/07/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less